PERSONEN FILTERS: pagina=16, s=Johannes Veirac
Gevonden personen:
Pieter Johannes Uylenbroek
MALEAmsterdam, Netherlands 25-11-1772 - † Leiden, Netherlands 11-11-1844
Member Group(s)
- KNAW-Lid
Variant Names
N/ABIO
Dissertation: JBN. Haukal en de Geographie van Irak in PerzieHighest degree: phd
Fields of interest:
Biography:
Published (together with other mathematicians) some of the correspondence by Christiaan Huygens
Residence
- Leiden 
Occupation
- professor  - Universiteit Leiden
Education
- Educated in Mathematics at  - Maatschappij van Verdiensten onder de Zinspreuk ‘Felix Meritis, departement Natuurkunde
Membership
- Koninklijk Instituut, eerste klasse
Member 20-07-1833 - Koninklijk Instituut, eerste klasse
Correspondent, living in the Netherlands 19-12-1829
Provenance
- Uylenbroek, P.J., Verslagen Instituut Klasse I, 1845, p. 183-184 door C.G.C. Reinwardt.
Publications
N/A
Johannes Jacobus van Drunen
MALEBennebroek, Netherlands 04-09-1733 - † 's-Hertogenbosch, Netherlands 03-06-1804
Member Group(s)
- Genootschaps-lid
Variant Names
N/ABIO
Dissertation: N/AHighest degree: N/A
Fields of interest:
Biography:
Minister and professor of Oriental languages.
Residence
N/AOccupation
- minster 20-08-1757 - 1764, Nieuw- en Sint Joostland
- minister 13-01-1765 - 13-04-1766, Haamstede
- minister 1766 - 1772, Goes
- minister 14-06-1772, 's-Hertogenbosch
- professor of oriental languages 11-11-1773
Education
- student 23-06-1753 - Universiteit Leiden
Membership
- (Koninklijk) Zeeuwsch Genootschap der Wetenschappen
member 29-11-1768 - 1804
Provenance
- Lalande, J.J. de. Voyage de Hollande, Paris, Bibliothèque de l’Institut de France, Ms 2195, p. 106.
Publications
N/A
Pieter Johannes Gaillard
MALERotterdam, Netherlands 18-01-1907 - † Oegstgeest, Netherlands 08-03-1992
Member Group(s)
- KNAW-Lid
Variant Names
N/ABIO
Dissertation: N/AHighest degree: N/A
Fields of interest:
Biography:
N/A
Residence
- Leiden 
Occupation
N/AEducation
N/AMembership
- Koninklijke Nederlandsche Akademie van Wetenschappen
Member Afd. Natuurkunde 24-06-1947
Provenance
- Gaillard, P.J., Levensberichten en herdenkingen 1993, p. 25-28 door P. van Duijn.
Publications
Member Group(s)
- KNAW-Lid
Variant Names
N/ABIO
Dissertation: N/AHighest degree: N/A
Fields of interest:
Biography:
N/A
Residence
- Glimmen 
Occupation
N/AEducation
N/AMembership
- Koninklijke Nederlandsche Akademie van Wetenschappen
Member Afd. Natuurkunde 05-06-1950
Provenance
- Backer, H.J., Verslagen Natuurkunde 68, 1959, p. 55 door M.W. Woerdeman; Jaarboek 1958/59, p. 297-301 door J.H. de Boer.
Publications
Cornelis Johannes de Groot
MALEDen Helder, Netherlands 27-01-1883 - † Den Haag, Netherlands 02-08-1927
Member Group(s)
- KNAW-Lid
Residence
- Bandung 
Occupation
N/AEducation
N/AMembership
- Koninklijke Nederlandsche Akademie van Wetenschappen
Correspondent Afdeling Natuurkunde 28-05-1927
Provenance
- Groot, C.J. de, Verslagen Natuurkunde 46, 1937, p. 709-710 door F.A.F.C. Went.
- http://radiokootwijk.free.fr/index.php?file=irdegroot.php
Publications
N/AMember Group(s)
- Genootschaps-lid
Residence
N/AOccupation
N/AEducation
N/AMembership
Provenance
N/APublications
N/AWiki and VIAF
Wiki Data: N/AVIAF: N/A
Member Group(s)
- Genootschaps-lid
Residence
N/AOccupation
N/AEducation
N/AMembership
Provenance
N/APublications
N/AWiki and VIAF
Wiki Data: N/AVIAF: N/A
Member Group(s)
- Boerhaave (instrumentenmakers)
Variant Names
- Caminada, Jan
BIO
Dissertation: N/AHighest degree: N/A
Fields of interest:
Biography:
Scientific instrument maker in Delft. Last surviving son of the Delft barometer maker Carlo Antonio Caminada (1757-1828). He continued his father's business in the workshop on the Koornmarkt no.83, where he made barometers and drawing compasses. With his wife, Joanna Catharina van Brussel (1810-1897), Caminada had four sons, all of whom became instrument makers. Carel Antonius (1829-1921) and Johannes Antonius (1830-1887) had a Rotterdam-based company, Pieter (1837-1922) and Hendricus Johannes' (1842-1882) firm was located in The Hague, where they traded under the name of 'Gebroeders Caminada'.
Collections: Maritiem Museum, Rotterdam, Museum Vlaardingen, Marinemuseum, Den Helder.
Residence
- Delft 1820 - 1878
Occupation
- instrument maker 1820 - 1878, Delft
Education
N/AMembership
N/AProvenance
- Bolle, B., Barometers in beeld (Lochem/Poperinge 1983), 174; 243; 245..
- Rooseboom, M., Bijdrage tot de geschiedenis der instrumentmakerskunst in de noordelijke Nederlanden (Leiden 1950).
- 1856-1906: Vijftig-jarig bestaan van de fabriek Firma Gebr. Caminada Rotterdamí>. (Rotterdam 1906).
Publications
N/AWiki and VIAF
Wiki Data: N/AVIAF: N/A
Member Group(s)
- Boerhaave (instrumentenmakers)
Variant Names
- Rienks, Syds Johannes
BIO
Dissertation: N/AHighest degree: N/A
Fields of interest:
Biography:
Syds Johannes Rienks (1770-1845) was a microscope and telescope maker from Ferwerderadeel. He developed his skills until he could make a living as a professional instrument maker. Trained by Arjen Roelofs in 1798, he went to Delft in 1805, where he worked for a short time in the scientific instrument factory of Onderdewijngaart Canzius. After the closure of this facory in 1810 he returned to Friesland. In 1819-1825 (by the order of King Willem I) Rienks and his companion Roelofs were commisioned to make two large telescopes for the astronomical observatories in Utrecht and Leiden. However these telescopes appeared to be useless for astronomy. Nevertheless Rienks again moved to Holland in 1826, this time to Leiden, where he stayed until his death in 1845.
Collections: Museum Boerhaave, Leiden (reflecting microscopes and reflecting telescopes - also a mirror signed 'Rienks en Beijerinck'), Universiteitsmuseum, Utrecht, Eisinga Planetarium, Franeker, Scheepvaartmuseum, Amsterdam, Teylers Museum, Haarlem, Louwman Collection of Historic Telescopes, Wassenaar.
Residence
- Delft 1805 - 1810
- Ferwert 1816 - 1822
- Hallum 1810 - 1816
- Berlicum 1822 - 1826
- Leiden 1826 - 1845
Occupation
- microscope and telescope maker 1826 - 1845, Leiden
- telescope maker 1798 - 1805~, Hallum
- telescope maker 1805~ - 1806~, Delft
- microscope and telescope maker 1806~ - 1826, Hallum
Education
N/AMembership
N/AProvenance
- Rooseboom, M., Bijdrage tot de geschiedenis der instrumentmakerskunst in de noordelijke Nederlanden (Leiden 1950).
- Bilt, J. van der, De grote spiegelkijkers van Roelofs en Rienks : een episode uit de geschiedenis der Leidse en Utrechtse sterrewachten (1821-1846) (Leiden 1951).
- Bilt, J. van der ‘Over de kleine kijkers en de microscopen van Sieds Johannes Rienks’, in: Hemel en dampkring 50 (1952), 181–191.
- Meerman, J. 'Merkwaardige Berigten wegens drie uitmuntende vervaardigers van optisch en andere physische instrumenten', in: Algemeene Konst- en Letterbode II (Haarlem 1810), 4-9, 19-25.
- Rienks, S.J. 'Afbeelding en beschrijving van eenen nieuwen aardwagen uitgevonden door S.J. Rienks', in: Algemeene Konst- en Letterbode I (Haarlem 1829), 233-235.
- Louwman, P.J.K. & H.J. Zuidervaart, A certain instrument for seeing far. Four centuries of styling the telescope, Illustrated by a selection of treasures from the Louwman Collection of Historic Telescopes (Wassenaar, 2013)
- Zuidervaart, H.J. 'Reflecting 'Popular Culture' : The Introduction, Diffusion, and Construction of the Reflecting Telescope in the Netherlands', in: Annals of Science 61, afl. 4 (2004), 407-452.
- Spoor, A. ‘Enige metingen en opmerkingen over spiegelkijkers van Rienks, Hommema en Heidanus’, in: De Vrije Fries, 41 (1953), 108–111.
Publications
N/AWiki and VIAF
Wiki Data: N/AVIAF: N/A
Member Group(s)
- Boerhaave (instrumentenmakers)
Variant Names
N/ABIO
Dissertation: N/AHighest degree: N/A
Fields of interest:
Biography:
In 1857, instrument maker Johannes van Deene started his own workshop on the Heiligeweg in Amsterdam, where he made chemical and physical glass work. He moved his company to the Rokin in 1867. In the same year, his two sons became partners in his firm, a partnership that lasts until 1877. In the ten years father and sons worked closely together, the firm moved a couple of times. In 1877, when his sons had left the firm, he established his workshop on the Warmoesstraat 119. Eight years later, in 1885, he moved to the Wijde Lombardsteeg 5 and in 1902 to the Albert Cuypstraat 100. That was also the last year Van Deene worked as an instrument maker. He won several prizes for his thermometers at national exhibitions. He held a Royal warrant of appointment for his thermometers and hydrometers.
Collection: Museum Boerhaave Leiden, Teylers Museum Haarlem.
Residence
- Amsterdam 1857 - 1902
Occupation
- instrument maker 1857 - 1902, Amsterdam
- instrument maker and repairer 1865 - 1884 - Teylers Museum
Education
N/AMembership
N/AProvenance
- http://www.gedbas.genealogy.net/person/show/1126389094
- "Familiebericht". "Het nieuws van den dag : kleine courant". Amsterdam, 19-01-1903. Geraadpleegd op Delpher op 23-02-2017, http://resolver.kb.nl/resolve?urn=ddd:010128480:mpeg21:a0163
Publications
N/AWiki and VIAF
Wiki Data: N/AVIAF: N/A
Member Group(s)
- Database Clusius
Variant Names
N/ABIO
Dissertation: N/AHighest degree: N/A
Fields of interest:
Biography:
Son of Wolfgang Palz-Zweibrücken and Anna von Hessen, cousin of landgrave William IV of Hessen-Kassel. Lutheran, later Calvinist. Interested in history and gardening. Corresponded with landgrave William IV and Carolus Clusius about plants and gardening.
Residence
- Zweibrücken 1550 - 1604
Occupation
- prince 
Education
N/AMembership
N/AProvenance
- E. van Gelder, Tussen hof en keizerskroon. Carolus Clusius en de ontwikkeling van de botanie aan Midden-Europese hoven (1573-1593) (Leiden 2011) 161, 204, 225.
Publications
N/AMember Group(s)
- Boerhaave (instrumentenmakers)
Variant Names
N/ABIO
Dissertation: N/AHighest degree: N/A
Fields of interest:
N/A
Biography:
Pharmacist. Sold several chemicals used for chemical experiments to Felix Merites between 1820 and 1827, in 1829 and in 1830.. His widow also sold chemicals to the organization after her husband's death.
Residence
N/AOccupation
N/AEducation
N/AMembership
N/AProvenance
- Archive Museum Boerhaave
Publications
N/AWiki and VIAF
Wiki Data: N/AVIAF: N/A
Johannes Sebastiaan van Naamen
MALELeiden, Netherlands 22-04-1801 - † Amsterdam, Netherlands 29-03-1852
Member Group(s)
- Genootschaps-lid
Variant Names
N/ABIO
Dissertation: De confessione partis in judicio facta (1825)Highest degree: N/A
Fields of interest:
Biography:
Lawyer, judge and representative of the moderate liberals.
Residence
N/AOccupation
- member 22-10-1844 - 20-08-1850 - Tweede Kamer der Staten-Generaal
- member 1850-09 - 29-03-1852 - Provinciale Staten van Noord-Holland
- lawyer 1825 - 1835, Amsterdam
- judge 18-10-1835 - 01-10-1838 - Rechtbank van eerste aanleg (Amsterdam)
- judge 01-10-1838 - 29-03-1852 - Arrondissementsrechtbank (Amsterdam)
Education
- literature & law student 1814 - 1823 - Atheneum Illustre Amsterdam
- law student 05-05-1820 - 08-06-1825 - Hogeschool Utrecht
Membership
- Maatschappij tot Redding van Drenkelingen - Amsterdam
director (1839-1845); honorary director (1845-1852) 
Provenance
N/APublications
N/AWiki and VIAF
Wiki Data: N/AVIAF: N/A
Member Group(s)
- Genootschaps-lid
Variant Names
N/ABIO
Dissertation: De inficiatione instrumentorumHighest degree: mr.
Fields of interest:
Biography:
N/A
Residence
- Den Haag 1800~
Occupation
N/AEducation
- law student 1786 - 1790, Leiden
Membership
- Gezelschap ter Beoeffening der proefondervindelijke Wijsbegeerte in ’s Hage
Member 1798 - 1803~
Provenance
- Naamen der leden van het Gezelschap, ter beoeffening der proefondervindelijke wysbegeerte (Den Haag 1800).
- Molhuysen, P.C., en Fr.K.H. Kossmann (redactie), Nieuw Nederlandsch Biografisch Woordenboek. Deel 9. (Leiden 1933) 588.
- Naamen der leden van het Gezelschap, ter beoeffening der proefondervindelijke wysbegeerte (Den Haag 1803).
Publications
N/AWiki and VIAF
Wiki Data: N/AVIAF: N/A
Member Group(s)
- Genootschaps-lid
Variant Names
N/ABIO
Dissertation: N/AHighest degree: Mr.
Fields of interest:
N/A
Biography:
member of the Board of Aldermen (1767), "Ordinair Lid in den Achtbaaren Raad van Justitie" (1768) in Batavia
Residence
N/AOccupation
- Ordinair Lid in den Achtbaaren Raad van Justitie 1768~, Batavia
- member of the Board of Aldermen 1767~
Education
- student 1760 - 1763~ - Universiteit Leiden
Membership
Provenance
N/APublications
N/AWiki and VIAF
Wiki Data: N/AVIAF: N/A
Member Group(s)
- Genootschaps-lid
Variant Names
N/ABIO
Dissertation: N/AHighest degree: N/A
Fields of interest:
Biography:
Arbon was "Ridder in de orde van den Nederl. Leeuw". He was navigation and mathematics teacher in Rotterdam.
Residence
- Rotterdam 1830~ - 1850~
Occupation
- examinator der stuurlieden 1806~ - 1841~, Rotterdam
- lector in de wiskunde aan de Erasmus school , Rotterdam
- arrondissementsijker 1821 - 1857
- lector in de zeevaartkunde 1841~, Rotterdam
- lector in de wis- en zeevaartkunde bij de Koninklijke Marine 1850~, Rotterdam
- lid van commissie tot het examineren der zeeofficieren 1850~, Rotterdam
Education
N/AMembership
- Wiskundig Genootschap onder de zinspreuk ‘Een onvermoeide Arbeid komt alles te boven’ - Amsterdam
member and correspondent for Rotterdam (~1830) 1813 - 1850~
Provenance
- “Naamlijst der leden van het wiskundig genootschap”, in: Verzameling van wiskundige voorstellen (Amsterdam 1830).
- 'Arbon (Johannes George)', in: (Molhuysen, P.C., en P.J. Blok (red.), Nieuw Nederlandsch biografisch woordenboek. Deel 2 (Leiden 1912) 39.
- “Naamlijst der leden van het wiskundig genootschap”, in: Verzameling van nieuwe wiskundige voorstellen (Amsterdam 1841).
- “Naamlijst der leden van het wiskundig genootschap”, in: Verzameling van wiskunstige opgaven. (Amsterdam 1850).
- “Naamlijst der leden van het wiskundig genootschap”, in: Verzameling van nieuwe wiskundige voorstellen (Amsterdam 1846).
Publications
N/AWiki and VIAF
Wiki Data: N/AVIAF: N/A
Member Group(s)
- Genootschaps-lid
Variant Names
N/ABIO
Dissertation: N/AHighest degree: N/A
Fields of interest:
Biography:
N/A
Residence
- Amsterdam 1802~ - [..1809]
- Emmerich 1809~ - [..1830]
- Utrecht 1830~
Occupation
N/AEducation
N/AMembership
Provenance
- “Naamlijst der leden des genootschaps”, in: Wiskunstig mengelwerk (Amsterdam 1802).
- “Naamlijst der leden van het wiskundig genootschap”, in: Wiskunstige oefeningen (Amsterdam 1809).
- “Naamlijst der leden van het wiskundig genootschap”, in: Verzameling van wiskundige voorstellen (Amsterdam 1830).
Publications
N/AWiki and VIAF
Wiki Data: N/AVIAF: N/A
Johannes Gerrit Willem Merkes
MALEGendt, Netherlands 21-02-1798 - † Dordrecht, Netherlands 10-10-1859
Member Group(s)
- Genootschaps-lid
Variant Names
- Merkes van Gendt, Jhr. Johannes Gerrit Willem
BIO
Dissertation: N/AHighest degree: N/A
Fields of interest:
Biography:
He was "adjudant van Z.M. den Koning der Nederlanden in The Hague in ~1841.
Residence
- Den Haag 1841~
Occupation
- aspirant-ingenieur 1813 - 1815
- Ingenieur 1815~
- adjudant van Z.M. den koning der Nederlanden 1841~
Education
- at latijnse school , Nijmegen
- student 1815 - Koninklijke Artillerie- en Genieschool, Delft
Membership
Provenance
- “Naamlijst der leden van het wiskundig genootschap”, in: Verzameling van nieuwe wiskundige voorstellen (Amsterdam 1841).
- Aa, A.J. van der, Biograpisch Woordenboek der Nederlanden. Deel 12. (Haarlem 1869) 644.
Publications
N/AWiki and VIAF
Wiki Data: N/AVIAF: N/A
Member Group(s)
- Genootschaps-lid
Variant Names
N/ABIO
Dissertation: N/AHighest degree: N/A
Fields of interest:
Biography:
He was 'Onder-Constructeur en ingenieur der Marine" in Amsterdam.
Residence
- Amsterdam 1841~ - 1850~
Occupation
- Onder-Constructeur der Marine and ingenieur 1841~ - 1850~, Amsterdam
Education
N/AMembership
Provenance
- Naamlijst der leden van het wiskundig genootschap”, in: Verzameling van nieuwe wiskundige voorstellen (Amsterdam 1841).
- “Naamlijst der leden van het wiskundig genootschap”, in: Verzameling van wiskunstige opgaven. (Amsterdam 1850).
- Stadsarchief Amsterdam, Bevolkingsregisters 1851-1853, NL-SAA-22490689.
- “Naamlijst der leden van het wiskundig genootschap”, in: Verzameling van nieuwe wiskundige voorstellen (Amsterdam 1846).
Publications
N/AWiki and VIAF
Wiki Data: N/AVIAF: N/A
Member Group(s)
- Genootschaps-lid
Variant Names
N/ABIO
Dissertation: N/AHighest degree: N/A
Fields of interest:
N/A
Biography:
N/A
Residence
N/AOccupation
N/AEducation
N/AMembership
- Maatschappij van Verdiensten onder de Zinspreuk ‘Felix Meritis’
department member 1868 - 1885~
Provenance
- Naamlijst van de leden en donatrices der maatschappij Felix Meritis (Amsterdam 1875).
- Naamlijst van de leden en donatrices der maatschappij Felix Meritis (Amsterdam 1885).
- Stadsarchief Amsterdam, Bevolkingsregisters 1874-1893, NL-SAA-27986778.
Publications
N/AWiki and VIAF
Wiki Data: N/AVIAF: N/A